TX SB481 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to consumer information concerning facility-based physicians and notice and availability of mediation for balance billing by a facility-based physician.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to consumer information concerning facility-based physicians and notice and availability of mediation for balance billing by a facility-based physician.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-18 - House - SB 481Third Reading House (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-15 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-23HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2015-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2015-05-22SenateRecord vote
2015-05-22SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2015-05-22SenateRead
2015-05-22SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2015-05-19SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2015-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-18HouseRecord vote
2015-05-18HousePassed
2015-05-18HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-14HousePassed to 3rd reading
2015-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-14HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-05-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-05-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-30HouseReferred to Insurance
2015-04-30HouseRead first time
2015-04-10HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-04-09SenateReported engrossed
2015-04-09SenateRecord vote
2015-04-09SenatePassed
2015-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-09SenateRecord vote
2015-04-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-04-09SenateRecord vote
2015-04-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2015-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-04-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-04-09SenateCo-author authorized
2015-04-07SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-04-01SenateCo-author authorized
2015-03-31SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-03-31SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-24SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-03-24SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-03-24SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-24SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-02-10SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2015-02-10SenateRead first time
2015-02-06SenateFiled
2015-02-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback