TX SB481 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the removal of a guardian of an incapacitated person ordered by a court.
Title
Relating to the removal of a guardian of an incapacitated person ordered by a court.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-23 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-16 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-16 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-16 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-10 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-09 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-05-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2011-04-28 | Read first time | |
2011-03-24 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-24 | Record vote | |
2011-03-24 | Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-24 | Record vote | |
2011-03-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-24 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-24 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-01 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2011-02-14 | Read first time | |
2011-02-01 | Filed | |
2011-02-01 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--General
GUARDIANS & WARDS
INCAPACITATED PERSONS
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts
Courts--General
GUARDIANS & WARDS
INCAPACITATED PERSONS
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts