TX SB475 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to state agency and local government information management and security, including establishment of the state risk and authorization management program and the Texas volunteer incident response team; authorizing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state agency and local government information management and security, including establishment of the state risk and authorization management program and the Texas volunteer incident response team; authorizing fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1474 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 See remarks for effective date
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-28HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28SenateRecord vote
2021-05-28SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-28SenateRead
2021-05-28SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-25SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1474
2021-05-25HousePassed
2021-05-25HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-14HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-28HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-28HouseRead first time
2021-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-19SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-13SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-12SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-09SenateReferred to Finance
2021-03-09SenateRead first time
2021-01-27SenateFiled
2021-01-27SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB475
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00475I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00475S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00475E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00475H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00475F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00475I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00475I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00475S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00475S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00475H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00475H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00475F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-19-F1.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB475&RcdVtNo=1474&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=84

Bill Comments

feedback