TX SB474 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-37)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-05-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the unlawful restraint of a dog; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the unlawful restraint of a dog; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors

Sen. Eddie Lucio [D]Sen. Carol Alvarado [D]Sen. Cesar Blanco [D]Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D]
Sen. Jose Menendez [D]Sen. John Whitmire [D]Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]
Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Claudia Ordaz Perez [D]
Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Michelle Beckley [D]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]
Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Angie Button [R]
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Elizabeth Campos [D]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]
Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]
Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Art Fierro [D]Rep. James Frank [R]
Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Sam Harless [R]
Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]
Rep. Lacey Hull [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Jacey Jetton [R]
Rep. Ann Johnson [D]Rep. Julie Johnson [D]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]
Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D]
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Terry Meza [D]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D]
Rep. Christina Morales [D]Rep. Eddie Morales [D]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]
Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]
Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Four Price [R]
Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]
Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]
Rep. Carl Sherman [D]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. James Talarico [D]
Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. John Turner [D]
Rep. Cody Vasut [R]Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]

Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1198 (Y: 83 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-27SenateRead
2021-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-18SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1198
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-13HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-13HouseAmendment fails of adoption 1-C. Bell
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-13HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 873
2021-05-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-07HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-07HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-26HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-04-26HouseRead first time
2021-04-22HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-21SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-21SenateRecord vote
2021-04-21SenatePassed
2021-04-21SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-21SenateRecord vote
2021-04-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-21SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-09SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-03-09SenateRead first time
2021-02-23SenateCo-author authorized
2021-01-27SenateFiled
2021-01-27SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB386 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
HB873 (Same As) 2021-05-13 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB474
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00474I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00474S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00474E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00474H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00474F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00474H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00474I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00474I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00474H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00474H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-21-F.PDF#page=15
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB474&RcdVtNo=1198&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=73

Bill Comments 750

feedback