TX SB47 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to processes to address election irregularities; providing a civil penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to processes to address election irregularities; providing a civil penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Senate - Ordered not printed (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-05 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-05 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-06HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-10-05SenateReported engrossed
2021-10-05SenateRecord vote
2021-10-05SenatePassed
2021-10-05SenateRead 3rd time
2021-10-05SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-10-05SenateRecord vote
2021-10-05SenateOrdered not printed
2021-10-05SenatePrinting rule suspended
2021-10-05SenateRecord vote
2021-10-05SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-10-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-10-05SenateAmended
2021-10-05SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 Hall
2021-10-05SenateRecord vote
2021-10-05SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-10-05SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Johnson
2021-10-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-10-05SenateAmended
2021-10-05SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Bettencourt
2021-10-05SenateRead 2nd time
2021-10-05SenateRecord vote
2021-10-05SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-10-05SenateOrdered not printed
2021-10-05SenatePrinting rule suspended
2021-10-05SenateCo-author authorized
2021-10-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-10-04SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-10-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-10-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-10-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-10-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-10-01SenateRead first time
2021-10-01SenateFiled
2021-10-01SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=873&Bill=SB47
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/billtext/html/SB00047I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/billtext/html/SB00047S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/billtext/html/SB00047E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/amendments/html/SB00047S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/amendments/html/SB00047S2F2.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/amendments/html/SB00047S2F3.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/analysis/html/SB00047I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/fiscalnotes/html/SB00047I.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/873/pdf/87S310-05-F1.PDF#page=27
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/873/pdf/87S310-05-F1.PDF#page=28
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/873/pdf/87S310-05-F1.PDF#page=29
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/873/pdf/87S310-05-F.PDF#page=3

Bill Comments

feedback