TX SB467 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a requirement for ballot propositions.
Title
Relating to a requirement for ballot propositions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-11 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Elections |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-06 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |