TX SB467 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-11 - Referred to Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-11 - Referred to Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the power of the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality to authorize certain injection wells that transect or terminate in the Edwards Aquifer.
Title
Relating to the power of the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality to authorize certain injection wells that transect or terminate in the Edwards Aquifer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-05-11 | Read first time | |
2011-05-10 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-10 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-10 | Record vote | |
2011-05-10 | Passed | |
2011-05-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-10 | Record vote | |
2011-05-10 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-10 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-10 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-10 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-10 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-28 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-19 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-02-14 | Read first time | |
2011-01-31 | Filed | |
2011-01-31 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
EDWARDS AQUIFER
Environment
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
INJECTION WELLS
WATER
Water--General
Water--Rights
Environment
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
INJECTION WELLS
WATER
Water--General
Water--Rights