TX SB463 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of individual graduation committees to satisfy certain public high school graduation requirements and other alternative methods to satisfy certain public high school graduation requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of individual graduation committees to satisfy certain public high school graduation requirements and other alternative methods to satisfy certain public high school graduation requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2013 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Amended RV#1606 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - FA2 Rodríguez (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 See remarks for effective date
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-28SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-27SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-27SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-27SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-27HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-27HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-26HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-26SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-26SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-26SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-26SenateRead
2017-05-26SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-23SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed as amended
2017-05-23HouseAmended
2017-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-12HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-05-02HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-01SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-01SenateRecord vote
2017-05-01SenatePassed
2017-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-01SenateRecord vote
2017-05-01SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-01SenateRecord vote
2017-05-01SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-01SenateRecord vote
2017-05-01SenateAmended
2017-05-01SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-01SenateAmended
2017-05-01SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-01SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-20SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-10SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-03-30SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-22SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-21SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-06SenateReferred to Education
2017-02-06SenateRead first time
2017-01-12SenateFiled
2017-01-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB463
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00463I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00463S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00463E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00463H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00463F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB463&RcdVtNo=1606&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-01-F.PDF#page=154
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB463&RcdVtNo=2013&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-01-F.PDF#page=153
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=58

Bill Comments

feedback