TX SB462 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Pensions, Investments & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Pensions, Investments & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to ballot propositions authorizing certain political subdivisions to issue debt obligations.
Title
Relating to ballot propositions authorizing certain political subdivisions to issue debt obligations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-04-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Finance
DEBT
Education
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--School Districts
Elections
Elections--General
Political Subdivisions
SECRETARY OF STATE
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
County Government--Finance
DEBT
Education
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--School Districts
Elections
Elections--General
Political Subdivisions
SECRETARY OF STATE
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate