TX SB461 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to providing certain discharged or released inmates with documentation to assist in obtaining employment.
Title
Relating to providing certain discharged or released inmates with documentation to assist in obtaining employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB918 (Same As) 2019-06-02 - Effective on 1/1/20
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB461 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00461I.htm |