TX SB45 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-2)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prohibition against sexual harassment in the workplace.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prohibition against sexual harassment in the workplace.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1199 (Y: 104 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-05-30 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-19 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-19HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-19SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-18SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-18SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1199
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-13HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-13HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 48
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-21HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2021-04-06HouseRead first time
2021-03-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-03-25SenateReported engrossed
2021-03-25SenateRecord vote
2021-03-25SenatePassed
2021-03-25SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-25SenateRecord vote
2021-03-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-03-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-03-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-03-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-09SenateFiled
2020-11-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB48 (Same As) 2021-05-13 - Companion considered in lieu of SB 45

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB45
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00045I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00045S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00045E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00045H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00045F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00045I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00045I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00045H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00045F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-25-F.PDF#page=11
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB45&RcdVtNo=1199&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2021

Bill Comments

feedback