TX SB448 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Texas Department of Transportation to mitigate adverse environmental impacts resulting from the construction, improvement, or maintenance of state highways or state highway facilities.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Texas Department of Transportation to mitigate adverse environmental impacts resulting from the construction, improvement, or maintenance of state highways or state highway facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] | Rep. Joe Pickett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-28 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-21 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-20 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-18 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-04-14 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time | |
2009-04-02 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Passed | |
2009-04-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-02 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-02 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-02 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-02-25 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-02-25 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-02-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-02-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2009-01-09 | Filed | |
2009-01-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |