TX SB44 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to leave for state employees who are volunteers of certain disaster relief organizations.
Title
Relating to leave for state employees who are volunteers of certain disaster relief organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#417 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#417 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-12 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-10 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-10 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-04-26 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-04-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#417 |
2021-04-23 | House | Passed |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-23 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 1345 |
2021-04-22 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-20 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-04-14 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-13 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Filed |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1345 (Same As) 2021-04-23 - Laid on the table subject to call