TX SB436 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the operation of the special education continuing advisory committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the operation of the special education continuing advisory committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-18HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-16HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-12HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-05-12HouseRead first time
2017-05-09HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-09SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-09SenateRecord vote
2017-05-09SenatePassed
2017-05-09SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-09SenateRecord vote
2017-05-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-03SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-03SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-25SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-25SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-06SenateReferred to Education
2017-02-06SenateRead first time
2017-01-06SenateFiled
2017-01-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback