TX SB435 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of a county treasurer.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of a county treasurer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-08 - House - SB 435Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-05-22 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-12 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-11 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-08 | House | Passed |
2015-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2015-05-04 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-30 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2015-04-27 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-24 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
COUNTY TREASURERS
Electronic Information Systems
OATHS
County Government--Employees/Officers
COUNTY TREASURERS
Electronic Information Systems
OATHS