TX SB430 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of the practice of dental hygiene.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of the practice of dental hygiene.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-09SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-26SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-04-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-10SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-05SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-30SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-06SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-02-06SenateRead first time
2017-01-06SenateFiled
2017-01-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback