TX SB425 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to property and casualty certificates of insurance and approval of property and casualty certificate of insurance forms by the Texas Department of Insurance; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to property and casualty certificates of insurance and approval of property and casualty certificate of insurance forms by the Texas Department of Insurance; providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-27 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Record vote | |
2011-05-27 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2011-05-27 | Motion to concur in House amendments | |
2011-05-27 | Remarks ordered printed | |
2011-05-27 | Motion withdrawn | |
2011-05-27 | Motion to concur in House amendments | |
2011-05-27 | Read | |
2011-05-27 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-24 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed as amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-21 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-21 | Amended | |
2011-05-21 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-21 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-05-21 | Postponed | |
2011-05-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-21 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-12 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-12 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to Insurance | |
2011-03-29 | Read first time | |
2011-03-21 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-17 | Record vote | |
2011-03-17 | Passed | |
2011-03-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-17 | Record vote | |
2011-03-17 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-17 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-17 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-17 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-07 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-07 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-01 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-07 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2011-02-02 | Read first time | |
2011-01-27 | Filed | |
2011-01-27 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Property & Casualty
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Property & Casualty