TX SB417 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notice to policyholders and agents of certain changes to property and casualty insurance policies.
Title
Relating to notice to policyholders and agents of certain changes to property and casualty insurance policies.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Hubert Vo [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-22 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-11 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-10 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2017-05-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-05 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2017-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Property & Casualty
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Property & Casualty