TX SB416 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the composition of the board of directors of the State Bar of Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the composition of the board of directors of the State Bar of Texas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-27 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1952 (Y: 113 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1333 (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Filed without the Governor's signature
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-27HouseRecord vote
2017-05-27HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-26SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-26SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-26HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-26HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-25HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-25HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-25HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-25SenateRead
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-18SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-18HouseRecord vote
2017-05-18HousePassed
2017-05-18HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-17HouseAmended
2017-05-17HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-17HousePostponed
2017-05-17HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-15HousePostponed
2017-05-15HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-05-03HouseRead first time
2017-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenatePassed
2017-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-28SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-28SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-28SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-23SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-23SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-02-01SenateRead first time
2017-02-01SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-06SenateFiled
2017-01-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB416
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00416I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00416S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00416E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00416H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00416F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-19-F1.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB416&RcdVtNo=1333&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB416&RcdVtNo=1952&Ch=H&Dt=05/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=36

Bill Comments

feedback