TX SB415 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a prohibition on the performance of dismemberment abortions; providing penalties; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to a prohibition on the performance of dismemberment abortions; providing penalties; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Passed to engrossment |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |