TX SB412 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-8)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-8)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to protections for pregnant and parenting students enrolled in public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to protections for pregnant and parenting students enrolled in public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1176 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-05-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-09 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-08 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-05-06 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#1176 |
2023-05-06 | House | Passed |
2023-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-06 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-06 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-06 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 1474 |
2023-05-04 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2023-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-06 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Reported from s/c with no recommendation |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Considered by subcommittee |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB413 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
HB1474 (Same As) 2023-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB1474 (Same As) 2023-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH