TX SB410 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-04 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-04 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to fetal development instruction included as part of the public school health curriculum in certain grade levels.
Title
Relating to fetal development instruction included as part of the public school health curriculum in certain grade levels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2023-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum