TX SB41 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the demand for an accounting from an attorney in fact or agent of a principal by certain persons.
Title
Relating to the demand for an accounting from an attorney in fact or agent of a principal by certain persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2017-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |