TX SB409 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the jurisdiction of county and justice courts in civil matters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the jurisdiction of county and justice courts in civil matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-05-05HouseRead first time
2017-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-11SenateRecord vote
2017-04-11SenatePassed
2017-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-11SenateRecord vote
2017-04-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-10SenateRecord vote
2017-04-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-03SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-02-01SenateRead first time
2017-01-03SenateFiled
2017-01-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback