TX SB402 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notice provided to persons with disabilities regarding the eligibility of persons with disabilities to use certain public transportation services.
Title
Relating to notice provided to persons with disabilities regarding the eligibility of persons with disabilities to use certain public transportation services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-16 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-12 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-10 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2017-04-18 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-12-29 | Senate | Filed |
2016-12-29 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Human Services
Human Services--Direct Assistance
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Human Services
Human Services--Direct Assistance
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
Transportation--Miscellaneous