TX SB40 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the provision of telehealth services by certain health professionals licensed by the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the provision of telehealth services by certain health professionals licensed by the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1223 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03 Effective immediately
2021-06-03 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-19SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-19SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-18HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HouseRecord vote RV#1223
2021-05-18HousePassed
2021-05-18HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-18HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-18HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-18HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-14HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-13HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-10HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-16HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-04-16HouseRead first time
2021-04-14HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-13SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-13SenateRecord vote
2021-04-13SenatePassed
2021-04-13SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-13SenateRecord vote
2021-04-13SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-13SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-13SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-13SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-13SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-12SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-07SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-07SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-31SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-09SenateFiled
2020-11-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB40
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00040I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00040S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00040E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00040H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00040F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00040I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00040I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00040S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00040S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00040E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00040H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00040F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-13-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB40&RcdVtNo=1223&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2021

Bill Comments

feedback