TX SB40 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to locations, terms, sessions, and procedures for conducting court proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to locations, terms, sessions, and procedures for conducting court proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1541 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07 Effective immediately
2019-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1541
2019-05-21HousePassed
2019-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-03-28HouseRead first time
2019-03-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-03-18SenateReported engrossed
2019-03-18SenateRecord vote
2019-03-18SenatePassed
2019-03-18SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-18SenateRecord vote
2019-03-18SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-03-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-18SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-03-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-03-18SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-11SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-11SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-28SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-02-28SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-02-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-28SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2018-11-12SenateFiled
2018-11-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2006 (Same As) 2019-04-08 - Considered in Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback