TX SB4 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-16 - Reported engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to abortion complication reporting and the regulation of drug-induced abortion procedures, providers, and facilities; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to abortion complication reporting and the regulation of drug-induced abortion procedures, providers, and facilities; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Posting rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-16SenateReported engrossed
2021-07-16SenateRecord vote
2021-07-16SenatePassed
2021-07-16SenateRead 3rd time
2021-07-16SenateRecord vote
2021-07-16SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-07-16SenateRecord vote
2021-07-16SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-07-16SenateRecord vote
2021-07-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-07-16SenateOrdered not printed
2021-07-16SenatePrinting rule suspended
2021-07-16SenateCo-author authorized
2021-07-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-07-15SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-07-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-07-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-07-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-07-13SenateRecord vote
2021-07-13SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-07-09SenateMeeting cancelled
2021-07-09SenateTagged
2021-07-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-07-08SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-07-08SenateRead first time
2021-07-08SenateCo-author authorized
2021-07-08SenateFiled
2021-07-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB6 (Same As) 2021-07-13 - Meeting cancelled
HB6 (Same As) 2021-07-13 - Meeting cancelled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=871&Bill=SB4
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/billtext/html/SB00004I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/billtext/html/SB00004S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/billtext/html/SB00004E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/analysis/html/SB00004I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/fiscalnotes/html/SB00004I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/fiscalnotes/html/SB00004S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/analysis/html/SB00004S.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/871/pdf/87S107-13-F.PDF#page=17
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/871/pdf/87S107-16-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/871/pdf/87S107-16-F.PDF#page=8

Bill Comments

feedback