TX SB4 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-27 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-27 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibiting certain transactions between a governmental entity and an abortion provider or affiliate of the provider.
Title
Relating to prohibiting certain transactions between a governmental entity and an abortion provider or affiliate of the provider.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - FA2 Schwertner (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - FA1 Schwertner (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - FA2 Schwertner (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - FA1 Schwertner (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-27 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Statement(s) submitted |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Statement(s) submitted |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Passed |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amended |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amended |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-07-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-07-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-07-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-07-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-07-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Point of order overruled |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Point of order |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Filed |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |