TX SB4 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a franchise or insurance premium tax credit for contributions made to certain educational assistance organizations; adding provisions subject to a criminal penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a franchise or insurance premium tax credit for contributions made to certain educational assistance organizations; adding provisions subject to a criminal penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-05HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2015-05-05HouseRead first time
2015-04-22HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-04-21SenateReported engrossed
2015-04-21SenateRecord vote
2015-04-21SenatePassed
2015-04-21SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-21SenateRecord vote
2015-04-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-04-20SenateReason for vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-20SenateRecord vote
2015-04-20SenatePassed to engrossment
2015-04-20SenateRecord vote
2015-04-20SenateAmendment tabled
2015-04-20SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-04-20SenateRecord vote
2015-04-20SenateAmendment tabled
2015-04-20SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-04-20SenateRecord vote
2015-04-20SenateAmendment tabled
2015-04-20SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-04-20SenateRecord vote
2015-04-20SenateAmendment tabled
2015-04-20SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-04-20SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-20SenateRecord vote
2015-04-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-04-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-04-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-04-13SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-04-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-26SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-03-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-16SenateReferred to Education
2015-03-16SenateRead first time
2015-03-13SenateFiled
2015-03-13SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback