TX SB398 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain resources and facilities for distributed generation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain resources and facilities for distributed generation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1440 (Y: 126 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-28HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28SenateRecord vote
2021-05-28SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-28SenateRead
2021-05-28SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-25SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1440
2021-05-25HousePassed
2021-05-25HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Zwiener
2021-05-25HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2021-05-25HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Zwiener
2021-05-25HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-24HouseAmended 1-Goldman
2021-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-22HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-22HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-14HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-14HouseRead first time
2021-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-09SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenatePassed
2021-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-09SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-08SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-04-09SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-08SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-31SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-31SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-31SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-30SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-23SenateNo action taken in committee
2021-03-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-09SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-03-09SenateRead first time
2021-01-22SenateFiled
2021-01-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3696 (Same As) 2021-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB398
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00398I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00398S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00398E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00398H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00398F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00398H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00398H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00398I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00398I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00398H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00398F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00398F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-09-F.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB398&RcdVtNo=1440&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=65

Bill Comments 750

feedback