TX SB397 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the consultation policies of local mental health authorities with respect to sheriffs and their representatives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the consultation policies of local mental health authorities with respect to sheriffs and their representatives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-15HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-15HouseReferred to Public Health
2017-05-15HouseRead first time
2017-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-04SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenatePassed
2017-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-04SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-24SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-05SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-05SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-05SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-01SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-02-01SenateRead first time
2016-12-21SenateFiled
2016-12-21SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback