TX SB39 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to estates and to guardianships, substitutes for guardianships, and durable powers of attorney for persons with disabilities or who are incapacitated.
Title
Relating to estates and to guardianships, substitutes for guardianships, and durable powers of attorney for persons with disabilities or who are incapacitated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1560 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1560 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | House | Passed |
2017-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-21 | House | Amended |
2017-05-21 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2017-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-06 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Lawyers
Probate
Probate--Durable Power of Attorney
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts
Lawyers
Probate
Probate--Durable Power of Attorney
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts