TX SB388 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the creation of a public corruption unit in the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas.
Title
Relating to the creation of a public corruption unit in the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-23 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-18 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-18 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-29 | Referred to Public Safety | |
2009-04-29 | Read first time | |
2009-04-27 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-24 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Passed | |
2009-04-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Amended | |
2009-04-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-24 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-24 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-15 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2008-12-23 | Filed | |
2008-12-23 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Ethics
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Criminal Procedure--General
Ethics
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions