TX SB385 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to voter approval of local acceptance and use of federal funds for commuter rail projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to voter approval of local acceptance and use of federal funds for commuter rail projects.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-23SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-22SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-01SenateReferred to Transportation
2017-02-01SenateRead first time
2016-12-20SenateFiled
2016-12-20SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback