TX SB384 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the scheduling of the administration of certain postsecondary readiness assessment instruments to public high school students.
Title
Relating to the scheduling of the administration of certain postsecondary readiness assessment instruments to public high school students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-12 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-12 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-05-12 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-09 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-12-20 | Senate | Filed |
2016-12-20 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing