TX SB384 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the promotion of toll projects by the Texas Department of Transportation.
Title
Relating to the promotion of toll projects by the Texas Department of Transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-04-06 | Read first time | |
2009-04-02 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Passed | |
2009-04-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-02 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-02 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-02 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-03-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-04 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-04 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2008-12-19 | Filed | |
2008-12-19 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2142 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor
HB4205 (Similar To) 2009-04-23 - Left pending in committee
HB4205 (Similar To) 2009-04-23 - Left pending in committee