TX SB383 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a highway toll exemption for public school buses.
Title
Relating to a highway toll exemption for public school buses.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB891 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Withdrawn from schedule
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB383 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00383I.htm |