TX SB38 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-24 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-24 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the inclusion of private postsecondary educational institutions and private career schools and colleges in the higher education accountability system of the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board.
Title
Relating to the inclusion of private postsecondary educational institutions and private career schools and colleges in the higher education accountability system of the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-19 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-11 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2011-04-28 | Read first time | |
2011-03-29 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-28 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-28 | Record vote | |
2011-03-28 | Passed | |
2011-03-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-28 | Record vote | |
2011-03-28 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-28 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-03-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-28 | Amended | |
2011-03-28 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-03-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-28 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-03-28 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-22 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-17 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-17 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-16 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed | |
2010-11-08 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Private Schools
Education--Higher--State Coordination
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Private Schools
Education--Higher--State Coordination
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS