TX SB378 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the persons authorized to conduct an inquest in certain counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the persons authorized to conduct an inquest in certain counties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-14SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-03-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-01SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-02-22SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-02-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-02-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-02-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-02-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-02-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-02-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-02-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-02-01SenateRead first time
2016-12-20SenateFiled
2016-12-20SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback