TX SB37 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a prohibition on the use of student loan default or breach of a student loan repayment or scholarship contract as a ground for refusal to grant or renew an occupational license or other disciplinary action in relation to an occupational license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a prohibition on the use of student loan default or breach of a student loan repayment or scholarship contract as a ground for refusal to grant or renew an occupational license or other disciplinary action in relation to an occupational license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1548 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1522 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07 Effective immediately
2019-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1548
2019-05-21HousePassed
2019-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1522
2019-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-26HouseReferred to Higher Education
2019-04-26HouseRead first time
2019-04-16HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-16SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenatePassed
2019-04-16SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-16SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-10SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-09SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-12SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-27SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2018-11-12SenateFiled
2018-11-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB218 (Same As) 2019-04-16 - Received from the House

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback