TX SB362 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to court-ordered mental health services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to court-ordered mental health services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1399 (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-15HouseRecord vote RV#1399
2019-05-15HousePassed
2019-05-15HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-14HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-14HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-29HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-23HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-15HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-04-15HouseRead first time
2019-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-11SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-09SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-01SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-26SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-07SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-01-16SenateFiled
2019-01-16SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3892 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback