TX SB349 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prosecution of the offense of possessing a weapon in certain prohibited places associated with schools or postsecondary educational institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prosecution of the offense of possessing a weapon in certain prohibited places associated with schools or postsecondary educational institutions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-12HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2017-05-12HouseRead first time
2017-05-09HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-09SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-09SenateRecord vote
2017-05-09SenatePassed
2017-05-09SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-09SenateRecord vote
2017-05-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-09SenateRecord vote
2017-05-09SenatePassed to engrossment
2017-05-09SenateRecord vote
2017-05-09SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-09SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-09SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-09SenateCo-author authorized
2017-05-04SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-26SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-25SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-25SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-24SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-24SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-24SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-01-30SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-01-30SenateRead first time
2016-12-16SenateFiled
2016-12-16SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback