TX SB345 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-22 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-22 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of tax revenue by certain municipalities for the payment of certain hotel-related bonds or other obligations.
Title
Relating to the use of tax revenue by certain municipalities for the payment of certain hotel-related bonds or other obligations.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] | Rep. Yvonne Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Effective immediately | |
2017-05-22 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2017-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-11 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-10 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2017-05-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-05 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-05-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-13 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Filed |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |