TX SB341 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-17 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-17 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing the dissolution of the Bexar Metropolitan Water District; providing a penalty.
Title
Relating to authorizing the dissolution of the Bexar Metropolitan Water District; providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | See remarks for effective date | |
2011-06-17 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2011-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-29 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-28 | Record vote | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-27 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-26 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-26 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-26 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-26 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2011-05-25 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-25 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-25 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-25 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-25 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2011-05-25 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2011-05-25 | Read | |
2011-05-25 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-24 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-21 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-21 | Record vote | |
2011-05-21 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-21 | Amended | |
2011-05-21 | Amended | |
2011-05-21 | Amended | |
2011-05-21 | Amended | |
2011-05-21 | Amended | |
2011-05-21 | Amended | |
2011-05-21 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2011-05-21 | Amendment amended | |
2011-05-21 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-21 | Amendment fails of adoption | |
2011-05-21 | Point of order overruled | |
2011-05-21 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-05-21 | Postponed | |
2011-05-21 | Point of order withdrawn | |
2011-05-21 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-21 | Amended | |
2011-05-21 | Amended | |
2011-05-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-05 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-05 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-03 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-03 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-02 | Recommitted to committee | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-14 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-03-29 | Read first time | |
2011-03-22 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-21 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-21 | Record vote | |
2011-03-21 | Passed | |
2011-03-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-21 | Record vote | |
2011-03-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-21 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-03-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-21 | Amended | |
2011-03-21 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-03-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-21 | Amended | |
2011-03-21 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-03-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-21 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-03-21 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-17 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-15 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-09 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-03-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-02-14 | Read first time | |
2011-01-19 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-01-12 | Filed | |
2011-01-12 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BEXAR METROPOLITAN WATER DISTRICT
CONSERVATORSHIP
Elections
Elections--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
CONSERVATORSHIP
Elections
Elections--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility