TX SB341 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-07 - Referred to Energy Resources
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-07 - Referred to Energy Resources
Summary
Relating to changing the name of the Railroad Commission of Texas to the Texas Energy Commission.
Title
Relating to changing the name of the Railroad Commission of Texas to the Texas Energy Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-07 | Referred to Energy Resources | |
2009-05-07 | Read first time | |
2009-05-04 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-01 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Passed | |
2009-05-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-01 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-02 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-02-11 | Read first time | |
2008-12-08 | Filed | |
2008-12-08 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB499 (Same As) 2009-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
ENERGY COMMISSION, TEXAS
RAILROAD COMMISSION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
RAILROAD COMMISSION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed