TX SB340 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prohibiting the use of photographic traffic signal enforcement systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibiting the use of photographic traffic signal enforcement systems.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-30SenateCo-author authorized
2015-03-10SenateCo-author authorized
2015-02-23SenateCo-author authorized
2015-02-02SenateReferred to Transportation
2015-02-02SenateRead first time
2015-01-23SenateFiled
2015-01-23SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback