TX SB339 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a seller's disclosure notice for residential property regarding floodplains, flood pools, floodways, or reservoirs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a seller's disclosure notice for residential property regarding floodplains, flood pools, floodways, or reservoirs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-23SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1608
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-15HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-13HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2019-05-02HouseRead first time
2019-04-25HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-24SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-24SenateRecord vote
2019-04-24SenatePassed
2019-04-24SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-24SenateRecord vote
2019-04-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-24SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-15SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-12SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-01-29SenateCo-author authorized
2019-01-11SenateFiled
2019-01-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3815 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback