TX SB334 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to broker agreements for the leasing of real property owned by a county.
Title
Relating to broker agreements for the leasing of real property owned by a county.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Filed |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
County Government--General
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property