TX SB331 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the temporary approval of a private or independent college or university to continue to participate in the tuition equalization grant program.
Title
Relating to the temporary approval of a private or independent college or university to continue to participate in the tuition equalization grant program.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Rep. Roberto Alonzo [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1561 (Y: 99 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Laid out as postponed business RV#1507 (Y: 88 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Laid out as postponed business RV#1507 (Y: 88 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-22 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | House | Passed |
2017-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-21 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-21 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-16 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Filed |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS